+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, House Committee on Appropriations
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 46
- File Number 69
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/14 5:00 PM
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- House Favorable
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/12
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with House Clerks 02/24
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor