+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Adopted, Senate
On April 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 544
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- On Consent Calendar
- Adopted, House
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- File Number 557
- House Calendar Number 407
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/22 5:00 PM
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor