+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, House Committee on Education
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 229
- File Number 415
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- House Favorable
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/17
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Education
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with House Clerks 02/14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor