+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Adopted, Senate
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 463
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- On Consent Calendar
- Adopted, House
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- File Number 617
- House Calendar Number 383
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/16 5:00 PM
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/21
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Vote
April 29, 2016: Senate Roll Call Vote 261
- Yeas: 36