+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Adopted, House
- Rules Suspended
- File Number 978
- House Calendar Number 634
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Favorable Report, House Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/28/19 10:00 AM
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- House Favorable
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 05/17
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with House Clerks 05/03
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor