+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Adopted, Senate
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 29
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- On Consent Calendar
- Adopted, House
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 15
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Public Hearing 01/13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor