+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, House Committee on Appropriations
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 432
- File Number 661
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/14 5:00 PM
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- House Favorable
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 04/15
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with House Clerks 04/04
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor