+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- File Number 3
- House Calendar Number 35
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Favorable Report, House Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/11/15 5:00 PM
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Favorable
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/04
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with House Clerks 01/16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor