+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Adopted, Senate
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 19
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Adopted, House
On February 18, 2018 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 15
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Public Hearing 02/16
+ − Vote
February 16, 2018: JUD Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 8