+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- File Number 235
- House Calendar Number 188
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Votes (2)
April 7, 2017: GAE Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 1
March 10, 2017: ENV Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor