+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Adopted, Senate
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 445
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted, House
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- File Number 645
- House Calendar Number 416
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/17 10:00 AM
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/24
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
May 10, 2017: House Roll Call Vote 130
- Yeas: 138
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 6
March 31, 2017: JUD Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor