+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Senate
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 381
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Adopted, House
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- House Calendar Number 318
- File Number 417
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 5:00 PM
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/17
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
- Vote to Draft
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor