+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- House Calendar Number 227
- File Number 297
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
+ − Votes (3)
April 7, 2017: GAE Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
March 17, 2017: TRA Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
January 23, 2017: TRA Vote Tally Sheet
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor