+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 668
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On June 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 945
- House Calendar Number 623
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/20/19 5:00 PM
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 04/29
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Sponsor
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor