+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 908
- Senate Calendar Number 497
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8239
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 827
- House Calendar Number 527
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/18
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor