+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 1027
- Senate Calendar Number 658
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9401
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 434
- House Calendar Number 286
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/12
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Public Safety and Security Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor