+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 501
- House Calendar Number 329
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/12
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
+ − Sponsor
Public Safety and Security Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor