+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 12, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act 19-179
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 380
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 154
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 118
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/13
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Education
+ − Sponsor
Education Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor