+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 971
- Senate Calendar Number 586
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7411
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 581
- House Calendar Number 354
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/13
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor