+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 408
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Public Health
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Public Health
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 299
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 207
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Sponsor
Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor