+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 12, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act 19-195
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9008
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 699
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 297
- House Calendar Number 205
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Education
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Education Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor