+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- File Number 362
- House Calendar Number 274
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 10:00 AM
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/09
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Vote
March 15, 2017: HED Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor