+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Rejected Bill
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8669
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- File Number 701
- House Calendar Number 457
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/17 5:00 PM
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 7, 2017: JUD Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 20
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor