+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 6, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act 17-102
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 436
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 635
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 406
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/17 10:00 AM
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2017: House Roll Call Vote 125
- Yeas: 145
- Absent: 6
March 29, 2017: JUD Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 39
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor