+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Transportation
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 150
- House Calendar Number 114
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/04
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsor
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor