+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 8, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act 19-169
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 536
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 781
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 489
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor