+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 346
- House Calendar Number 224
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/28
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor