+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 19, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act 17-128
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 687
- Senate Calendar Number 381
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6150
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- File Number 393
- House Calendar Number 288
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/13
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 19, 2017: House Roll Call Vote 69 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 5
March 22, 2017: PH Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor