+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act 19-49
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 412
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Education
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Education
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 424
- House Calendar Number 276
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/28
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Human Services Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor