+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 12, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act 19-161
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10982
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 689
- Rules Suspended
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 480
- House Calendar Number 305
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/25
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Transportation Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor