+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 93
- House Calendar Number 83
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/25
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsor
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor