+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 793
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 525
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 7565
- Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 7122
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Passed Temporarily
- House Designated House Amendment Schedule A 7122
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Public Health
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Public Health
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- File Number 189
- House Calendar Number 158
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/17 5:00 PM
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/02
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Amendments (11)
+ − Votes (2)
April 10, 2017: PH Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 1
March 7, 2017: GL Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsor
General Law Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor