+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 19, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act 17-132
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 364
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 354
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 266
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 10:00 AM
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/23
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Votes (2)
April 19, 2017: House Roll Call Vote 61
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 5
March 16, 2017: CE Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Commerce Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor