+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 11, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act 17-229
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8410
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 569
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- File Number 321
- House Calendar Number 236
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/17 5:00 PM
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/02
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Vote
March 15, 2017: HED Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1