+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 19, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act 17-145
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On June 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 588
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On June 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8351
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- File Number 695
- House Calendar Number 448
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/17 10:00 AM
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/20
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
April 4, 2017: JUD Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 3