+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act 17-187
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 686
- Senate Calendar Number 371
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6210
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- File Number 127
- House Calendar Number 122
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/21
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 19, 2017: House Roll Call Vote 77 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 138
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 10
March 7, 2017: INS Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor