+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act 17-125
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 813
- Senate Calendar Number 551
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6132
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- File Number 125
- House Calendar Number 120
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/23
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 8, 2017: FIN Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 6
March 7, 2017: INS Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor