+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Public Health
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 187
- House Calendar Number 137
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/07
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Children
Type:
Primary Sponsor