+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act 17-185
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 812
- Senate Calendar Number 561
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7439
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- File Number 715
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/17 5:00 PM
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- File Number 72
- House Calendar Number 84
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/17 5:00 PM
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/21
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 25, 2017: JUD Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 41
March 2, 2017: KID Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Children
Type:
Primary Sponsor