+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act 17-210
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On June 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 580
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On June 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8346
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- File Number 123
- House Calendar Number 118
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/21
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 7, 2017: KID Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Children
Type:
Primary Sponsor