+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 1, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act 19-145
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 962
- Senate Calendar Number 572
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9106
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 85
- House Calendar Number 75
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/07
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Banking
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Banking Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor