+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Public Act 15-179
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 513
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 749
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 492
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/27/15 5:00 PM
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/18
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 410 PASS
- Yeas: 36
May 13, 2015: House Roll Call Vote 100
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor