+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- File Number 8
- House Calendar Number 36
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/01/17 5:00 PM
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/07
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
+ − Vote
February 14, 2017: AGE Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Aging Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor