+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 885
- Senate Calendar Number 576
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6919
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- File Number 480
- House Calendar Number 310
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Education
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
May 20, 2015: House Roll Call Vote 182 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 143
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Education Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor