+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- File Number 387
- House Calendar Number 243
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/12
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Public Safety and Security Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor