+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 479
- House Calendar Number 304
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor