+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 409
- House Calendar Number 261
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/26
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor