+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act 17-181
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 613
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- House Calendar Number 200
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- File Number 260
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 5:00 PM
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2017: LAB Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1