+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Public Health
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Public Health
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- File Number 184
- House Calendar Number 127
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Children
Type:
Primary Sponsor