+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- File Number 381
- House Calendar Number 237
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Sponsor
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor